MD HB510 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, in Montgomery County, the Montgomery County Board of Education may utilize a school bus with doors that lock to transport students in the county if the school bus' locking system prevents the school bus from being operated when any bus exit is locked.
Title
Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105468/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Safety
School Buses
Education, Boards of
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Safety
School Buses