MD HB51 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 924
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 924
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the use of the Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund to require that the Fund be used only for pediatric cancer research instead of only for pediatric cancer research, prevention, and treatment and to allow funds from the Fund to be used for administrative expenses; and establishing the Pediatric Cancer Research Commission to oversee the award of competitive grants from the Fund and to develop criteria and a process for reviewing grant applications.
Title
Public Health - Maryland Pediatric Cancer Fund and Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 924 |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443828/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {483326/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB13 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 925
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Minors
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Governor
Health
Health, Department of
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Minors
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |