MD HB507 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act; authorizing a user to direct a custodian of digital assets to disclose or not to disclose those assets under specified circumstances and in a specified manner; providing that the Act does not change, impair, or expand specified rights with respect to the digital assets of a user; authorizing a custodian to grant a specified fiduciary or designated recipient access to or a copy of specified records under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365 |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {888976/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {106985/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Civil Actions
Contracts
Courts
Disclosure
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Guardians
Hearings
Liability
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Power of Attorney
Privacy
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Civil Actions
Contracts
Courts
Disclosure
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Guardians
Hearings
Liability
Personal Property
Personal Representatives
Power of Attorney
Privacy
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology