MD HB505 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1168
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1328
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1328
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing references to the terms "child custody" and "visitation" and substituting the terms "legal decision making" and "parenting time" in certain instances; authorizing the court to award joint legal decision making to both parties under certain circumstances; authorizing the court, in determining certain legal decision-making authority and parenting time in certain child custody proceedings, to consider certain factors; requiring the court to articulate certain findings of fact on the record or in a written opinion; etc.
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-6) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {512019/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB505 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
HB1328 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1328 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Armed Forces
Child Custody
Court Orders
Courts
Disabilities
Family Law
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Records
Residency
Safety
Armed Forces
Child Custody
Court Orders
Courts
Disabilities
Family Law
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Records
Residency
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 101.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 101.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 9 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |