MD HB504 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain public school employees to engage in a strike.
Title
Collective Bargaining - Public School Employees - Authorization to Strike
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 6 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 6 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0504?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0504f.pdf |