MD HB503 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Bureau of Revenue Estimates, beginning with the revenue estimate for fiscal year 2020, to calculate a specified share of General Fund revenues represented by specified nonwithholding income tax revenues; requiring the Bureau to make a specified adjustment to a specified revenue estimate relating to nonwithholding income tax revenues under specified circumstances; establishing the Fiscal Responsibility Fund to retain the amount of nonwithholding income tax revenues until the revenues are appropriated in the State budget; etc.
Title
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization Account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4 |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {444267/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
General Assembly
Governor
Income Tax
Investments
Legislation
Operating Budget
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Treasurers
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
General Assembly
Governor
Income Tax
Investments
Legislation
Operating Budget
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Treasurers