MD HB501 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting insurers that issue, sell, or deliver policies of motor vehicle liability insurance in the State from canceling the policy of a named insured or refusing to issue a policy to an applicant solely because the named insured or applicant is a volunteer driver; prohibiting specified insurers from imposing a surcharge solely because a driver under the policy is a volunteer driver; applying the Act prospectively to specified insurance policies issued, sold, delivered, or renewed on or after January 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Volunteer Drivers
Sponsors
Del. Mark Chang [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-40) (Y: 91 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-40) (Y: 91 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-40) |
2016-02-24 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103995/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Exemptions
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Names
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Volunteers
Exemptions
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Names
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Volunteers