MD HB501 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified law enforcement agency or unit, under specified circumstances, to give a specified victim or victims' representative timely notice as to specified matters relating to a specified DNA profile; requiring the State Board of Victim Services to develop pamphlets to notify victims and victims' representatives of how to request information regarding an unsolved case; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Crime - Notification Regarding DNA Profile
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {872115/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Evidence
Genetics
Law Enforcement
Notices
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Evidence
Genetics
Law Enforcement
Notices
Victims