MD HB5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain provisions of law governing the protection of information by government agencies applicable to the Legislative and Judicial branches of State government; requiring the Maryland Cybersecurity Coordinating Council to develop a Cybersecurity Awareness and Training Program; establishing certain criteria for the Program; requiring the State Chief Information Security Officer to coordinate with the Council to certify certain cybersecurity trainings; etc.
Title
State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-12 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB107 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Courts
Cybersecurity
Data
General Assembly
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Courts
Cybersecurity
Data
General Assembly
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 10 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13B | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13B | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13B | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10-13B | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0005?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0005f.pdf |