MD HB5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring commercial driver's license training schools to include training on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking as part of the curriculum; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include content on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking in its Commercial Driver's License Manual; and requiring the Administration to provide to an applicant renewing a commercial driver's license certain information from the Manual; etc.
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {660514/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-11-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Communications
Curriculum
Data
Disclosure
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Human Trafficking
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Reports
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Communications
Curriculum
Data
Disclosure
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Human Trafficking
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Reports
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration