MD HB499 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 905
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 905
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each owner of a private dental office to designate a licensed dentist to be the supervising dentist for the private dental office; requiring a supervising dentist to complete the registration required by the State Board of Dental Examiners and be responsible for all infection control activities within the private dental office; authorizing the Board to charge a fee for the registration of a supervising dentist under the Act; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Private Dental Offices - Infection Control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 905 |
2024-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {523624/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB335 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Dentists
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Medical Conditions
Registration
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Standards and Best Practices
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Managers and Supervisors
Medical Conditions
Registration
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Standards and Best Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |