MD HB497 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time frame of certain notices that a mobile home park owner is required to provide to each resident in the mobile home park and the Department of Housing and Community Development, and to post in a public area of the mobile home park, concerning the sale of the mobile home park, to be not less than 30 days before the date of the sale of the park.
Title
Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {820211/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |