MD HB497 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an exemption, under specified circumstances, from property tax for real property if, under specified circumstances, the owner of the real property is a specified limited liability company or is a specified limited partnership whose managing general partner is a specified limited liability company; providing that the real property may be exempt from property tax only under specified circumstances; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability Company
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-6) (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-6) (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253 |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-6) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Exemptions
Housing
Limited Liability Companies
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Property Tax
Taxes - Property
Exemptions
Housing
Limited Liability Companies
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Property Tax
Taxes - Property