MD HB487 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB19
Note: Carry Over of previous HB615
Note: Carry Over of previous HB615
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain county boards of education seeking State funds for the construction of a new school, or the renovation of or an addition to an existing school that would increase the capacity by more than 100 students, to submit a pedestrian safety plan to the Interagency Commission on School Construction under certain circumstances; requiring the Commission to review the plans in consultation with the State Highway Administration; providing for the contents of the plan to ensure safe routes for students to walk or bike to school; etc.
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-25) |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB487 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB615 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB615 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Howard County
Montgomery County
Pedestrians
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Students
Transportation
Urban Areas
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Howard County
Montgomery County
Pedestrians
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Rural Areas
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Students
Transportation
Urban Areas