MD HB486 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring county boards of education, nonpublic schools, and contracting agencies to require an applicant for a position involving direct contact with minors to submit certain information; requiring a county board, nonpublic school, or contracting agency to review the employment history of a certain applicant before hiring an applicant; requiring the county board, nonpublic school, or contracting agency to check certain eligibility of an applicant for a substitute position involving direct contact with minors; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {465866/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-04HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback