MD HB484 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB967
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim October 5 as Dashain Day, a festival originating in Nepal that celebrates and symbolizes victory of good over evil.
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Sponsors
Del. Harry Bhandari [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Mark Chang [D] | Del. Wanika Fisher [D] |
Del. Carl Jackson [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-5) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-28 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB484 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB470 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
SB470 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
International Affairs
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
International Affairs
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 7 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |