MD HB484 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a health care facility from providing peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis treatment services unless the individual performing the dialysis procedure has been trained in the peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis technique being performed; establishing civil penalties not exceeding $5,000 for each violation of the Act; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateReferred Finance
2021-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-02-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {593926/1 Adopted
2021-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-01-22HouseHearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB111 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Referred Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19114(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General202001(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General202002(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback