MD HB466 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the prevailing wage law to apply to specified structures or works constructed with specified bond proceeds in tax increment financing development districts established under State or local law; and applying the Act only to a contract executed on or after July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2017-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-27HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback