MD HB466 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-25)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-25)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation to establish a process by which a member of the General Assembly, another elected official, or any member of the general public may request that the Department dedicate a bridge or another appropriate structure under the jurisdiction of the Department to a specified deceased member of the armed forces or an emergency responder who died in the line of duty; etc.
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53 |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {447974/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {160110/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Bridges and Tunnels
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
General Assembly
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Law Enforcement
Monuments and Memorials
Public Officials
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Veterans
Bridges and Tunnels
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
General Assembly
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Law Enforcement
Monuments and Memorials
Public Officials
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Veterans