MD HB465 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the County Commissioners of Somerset County to adopt an emergency burning ban; prohibiting a person from starting or allowing any open air burning during an emergency burning ban subject to specified exceptions; authorizing the County Commissioners, by resolution, to set a fine for a violation of an emergency burning ban; and authorizing the Sheriff and the Sheriff's deputies to assess a fine against any person believed to be in violation of an emergency burning ban.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Somerset County - Emergency Burning Ban - Adoption and Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2013-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2013-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2013-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {400414/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2013-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-28HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0465?ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0465f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0465t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0465_40041401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0465.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0465_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0465_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/veto_letters/hb0465.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0465,h-0399&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0465,s-1086&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback