MD HB464 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring private career schools and certain for-profit institutions of higher education to provide certain students with certain information before the student signs an enrollment agreement, completes registration, or makes a financial commitment; requiring certain information to be displayed in a certain manner and on the school's or institution's websites; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection – Private Career Schools and For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education – Disclosures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-7) (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (130-7)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {764265/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {764265/1 Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback