MD HB463 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB199
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Architects in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2028, the termination provisions relating to certain statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Title
State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Del. Andre Johnson [D] | Del. Adrian Boafo [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Brian Crosby [D] |
Del. Steve Johnson [D] | Del. Andrew Pruski [D] | Del. Kym Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595 |
2023-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2023-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {943226/1 Adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2023-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {773727/1 Adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB199 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Qi, Charkoudian and Pippy)
Subjects
Architects
Business Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Labor, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Business Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Labor, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 3 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |