MD SB199 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 20 @ 1:00 pm Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing the State Board of Architects in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2033, the termination provisions relating to certain statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateHearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-09-21SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Occupations and Professions3201(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Occupations and Professions3702(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback