MD HB463 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Health to designate certain areas as Health Equity Resource Communities in a certain manner; specifying that the purpose of establishing Health Equity Resource Communities is to reduce health disparities, improve health outcomes, improve access to primary care, promote primary and secondary prevention services and reduce health care costs and hospital admissions and readmissions; authorizing certain credits against the State income tax for certain health care providers and organizations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Equity Resource Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseHearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2021-01-22HouseHearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2021-01-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB172 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-11 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General201401(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General201402(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General201403(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General201404(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General201405(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General201406(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General201407(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General201408(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10731(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback