MD SB172 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Pathways to Health Equity Program in the Community Health Resources Commission to provide the foundation and guidance for a permanent Health Equity Resource Community program; requiring the Program to provide grant funding to reduce health disparities, improve health outcomes, improve access to primary care, promote primary and secondary prevention services, and reduce health care costs; requiring the Commission to establish Health Equity Resource Communities to target State resources to certain areas for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {379935/1 Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {379935/1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB463 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Demographics
Emergency Bills
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Hospitals
Interest
Investments
Medical Assistance
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Tax Credits
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Demographics
Emergency Bills
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Hospitals
Interest
Investments
Medical Assistance
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
Tax Credits
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 731 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |