MD HB46 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering and clarifying the duties of the Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight.
Title
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-10 | House | Special Order until 2/11 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |