MD HB456 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in partnership with the Department of Aging, the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council, and the Alzheimer's Association, to incorporate information regarding cognitive impairment, Alzheimer's disease, and other types of dementia into relevant public health outreach programs administered by the Maryland Department of Health in order to educate health care providers and increase understanding of matters related to certain types of cognitive impairment; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB725 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Diseases
Education
Elderly Persons
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Communications
Disclosure
Diseases
Education
Elderly Persons
Examinations
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Physicians
Public Health
Public Information
Time
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 18 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |