MD HB455 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified provisions in a contract or an agreement relating to architectural, engineering, inspecting, or surveying services that purport to require the promisor or indemnitor to defend or pay the costs of defending specified promisees or indemnitees against liability for specified damages are against public policy and are void and unenforceable under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsors
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. John Cluster [R] | Del. Trent Kittleman [R] |
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Brett Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Architects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Construction
Contracts
Damages
Engineers
Inspections
Liability
Negligence
Surveyors
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Construction
Contracts
Damages
Engineers
Inspections
Liability
Negligence
Surveyors