MD HB454 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that each fiscal year $250,000 of undisputed taxes collected as a result of the Motor Vehicle Administration's refusal to renew or transfer certain vehicle registrations or renew the driver's license of certain applicants be distributed to the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund; establishing the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund to provide grants to certain law schools to operate tax clinics for low-income Marylanders; requiring the Secretary of Higher Education to administer the Fund; etc.
Title
Driver’s Licenses and Vehicle Registrations – Distribution of Tax Payments – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-30) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {745468/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters |
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorneys
Budgets
Comptroller
Grants
Higher Education
Interest
Investments
Licenses
Poverty
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Attorneys
Budgets
Comptroller
Grants
Higher Education
Interest
Investments
Licenses
Poverty
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
State Universities and Colleges
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 406.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |