MD HB440 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the number of new P-TECH Planning Grants that may be awarded in fiscal year 2020 to establish a new P-TECH school until after the 2016-2017 cohort of P-TECH students completes the 6-year pathway sequence; and altering certain intent language regarding a prohibition against additional P-TECH schools.
Title
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {485769/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2019-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Subjects
Budgets
Education
Education, Boards of
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Education, Boards of
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment