MD HB437 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making a false statement, report, or complaint to a public safety answering point with intent to deceive and to cause an investigation or other action to be taken; and providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment of up to 3 years or a fine of up to $500 or both.
Title
Criminal Law - False Statements - Public Safety Answering Points and Penalty
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {543428/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB57 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Services
Fraud
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Services
Fraud
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 9 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |