MD SB57 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making communications that are reasonably expected to impair the functioning of a public safety answering point or intended to disrupt an emergency response; prohibiting a person from making a false statement, report, or complaint to a public safety answering point or law enforcement officer that results in a certain response and providing a person who violates the Act is guilty of a felony and on conviction is subject to imprisonment of up to 5 years or a fine of up to $25,000, or both.
Title
Criminal Law - Public Safety - Communications With Public Safety Answering Points
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB437 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Services
Fraud
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Emergency Services
Fraud
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 9 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0057?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0057f.pdf |