MD HB435 | 2015 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


Requiring, on or before January 1, 2016, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to award a grant to a nonprofit organization to conduct a specified study related to the past practices regarding the treatment of patients at State psychiatric institutions; and requiring, as a condition of the grant and on or before December 1, 2016, the nonprofit organization awarded the grant to submit the results of the study to specified persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Award of Grant - Study of Past Practices at State Psychiatric Institutions



2015-04-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2015-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations


Maryland State Sources

Bill Comments