MD HB434 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to allow persons required to file a personal property tax report to file the report and pay the filing fee electronically; providing that a fee may be charged for each electronic filing; and providing the Act shall be applied to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Title
Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Aruna Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-26) (Y: 110 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {973229/1 Rejected (44-90) (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) Rejected (55-76) (Y: 55 N: 76 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {973229/1 Rejected (44-90) (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) Rejected (55-76) (Y: 55 N: 76 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-26) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {973229/1 Rejected (44-90) |
2014-03-13 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Parrott) Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (55-76) |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Zucker) Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {143825/1 |
2014-03-12 | House | Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {143825/1 |
2014-03-11 | House | Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {565664/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business Trusts
Corporations
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Foreign Trade
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Business Trusts
Corporations
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Foreign Trade
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property