MD HB432 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2022, the Maryland Transit Administration from purchasing buses for the Administration's State transit bus fleet that are not zero-emission buses; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2021, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; requiring the report to include a schedule for converting to zero-emission buses and a plan for transitioning any adversely affected State employees; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (112-22)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {220919/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB423 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation7406(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback