MD HB334 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB432
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2023, the Maryland Transit Administration from purchasing buses for the Administration's State transit bus fleet that are not zero-emission buses; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2022, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; requiring the report to include a schedule for converting to zero-emission buses and a plan for transitioning any adversely affected State employees; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act)
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
2020-09-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB137 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
HB432 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
HB432 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Buses
Communications
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Buses
Communications
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0334?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0334f.pdf |