MD HB421 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB479
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement that the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System provide a quarterly estimate of certain external investment management services; prohibiting the Board of Trustees from incurring fees for external investment management services that exceed a certain amount in a fiscal year; exempting from the prohibition certain fees incurred under a contract entered into on or before June 30, 2023; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB479 (Carry Over) 2021-01-19 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 21 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |