MD HB414 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Public Service Commission, when determining specified expenses while setting a just and reasonable rate for a gas company, to include all costs reasonably incurred by the gas company for performing environmental remediation of real property in response to a State or federal law, regulation, or order under specified conditions; authorizing that specified environmental remediation costs be included in a gas company's specified expenses regardless of specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (81-55) (Y: 81 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-04-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (81-55) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {953928/1 (Delegate Morhaim) Rejected |
2017-04-06 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Prices
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Prices
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Real Property
Utilities
Utility Regulation