MD HB408 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 907
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 907
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of a county's mental health advisory committee by including an individual with experience with mental health care for veterans or individuals serving in the military on the list of groups from which individuals may be appointed to the committee by the governing body of the county.
Title
Mental Health Law - County Mental Health Advisory Committees - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 907 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB412 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 906
Subjects
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Veterans
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Health
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |