MD HB40 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified staff of the Maryland Transportation Authority to provide, by a specified date, public notice regarding a proposal to increase specified tolls, fees, or other charges; requiring the Authority to make the proposal available to the public in a specified manner; and requiring the Authority to receive comments from the public at the meeting at which the Authority votes to implement the proposal.
Title
Transportation - Toll, Fee, or Other Charge Increases - Notice and Public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 1/25 at 11:00 a.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-10-20 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bridges and Tunnels
Electronic Government
Fees
Highways
Notices
Public Information
Transportation
Bridges and Tunnels
Electronic Government
Fees
Highways
Notices
Public Information
Transportation
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0040.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0040f.pdf |