MD HB4 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to rename the Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge as the Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge.
Title
Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas “Mac” Middleton Bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-35) (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {453622/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (37-88) (Y: 38 N: 89 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-35) (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {453622/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (37-88) (Y: 38 N: 89 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted (47-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-35) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {453622/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (37-88) |
2018-03-17 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {140617/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-11-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bridges and Tunnels
Highway Administration, State
Names
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Bridges and Tunnels
Highway Administration, State
Names
Transportation
Transportation - Highways