MD HB394 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a certain final order of the Commission on Civil Rights on a complaint alleging a discriminatory act is appealable in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
Human Relations - Commission on Civil Rights - Appeal of Final Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB50 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Subjects
Appeals
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commission on Civil Rights
Discrimination
Human Relations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commission on Civil Rights
Discrimination
Human Relations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 20 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |