MD HB392 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Baltimore City Board of Liquor License Commissioners to make the issuance and renewal of specified alcoholic beverages licenses conditional on the substantial compliance of the license holder with the terms of a memorandum of understanding between a community association and an applicant for an alcoholic beverages license in Baltimore City; establishing that the existence of a memorandum of understanding does not affect any requirement of any individuals to file a specified protest; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Memorandum of Understanding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 844931/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (124-11) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (125-12) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 843899/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Homeowners Associations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Homeowners Associations
License Commissioners, Boards of