MD HB391 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, in Prince George's County and Montgomery County, the board of appeals, the district council, or an administrative office or agency to provide notice of a hearing for a special exception to certain parties of record.
Title
Prince George's County and Montgomery County - Special Exception Hearings - Required Notice PG/MC 102-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {330119/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bi-County Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Hearings
Montgomery County
Notices
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning
Bi-County Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Hearings
Montgomery County
Notices
Prince George's County
Zoning and Planning