MD HB388 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the purposes for which a meeting of the board of directors of a condominium council of unit owners may be held in closed session.
Title
Maryland Condominium Act - Closed Meetings of Board of Directors
Sponsors
Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Sen. Wayne Norman [R] |
Del. Shane Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |