MD HB383 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each report on student performance that is published by the State Department of Education to include data disaggregated by student status under ยง 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973 and the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Student Performance Reports - Students With Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-02-07HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-23HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education8420(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback