MD HB375 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing exemptions from the Open Meetings Act for certain independent and regional development units; establishing enhanced requirements under the Open Meetings Act for certain public bodies; and providing that a project site visit or educational field tour is not a meeting for purposes of the Open Meetings Act for certain public bodies.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Application and Enhanced Requirements (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Floor Amendment 743824/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Floor Amendment 743824/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {433620/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | Floor Amendment {743824/1 (Delegate Mangione) Rejected (44-90) |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Delegate Griffith) Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {153727/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Disclosure
Information Technology, Department of
internet
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Officials
Recordings
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Video
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Disclosure
Information Technology, Department of
internet
meetings
Notices
Open Government
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Information
Public Officials
Recordings
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Video
Work, Labor, and Employment