MD HB373 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making the failure to wear a seat belt in a rear passenger seat of a motor vehicle a primary offense rather than a secondary offense; and requiring a specified motor vehicle passenger in a front seat position that is not adjacent to a door of a motor vehicle to be restrained by a seat belt.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-55) (Y: 83 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (83-55) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections