MD HB372 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a holder of a Class A license, a Class B-D-7 license, or an adult entertainment license issued by the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City from operating in a certain area in Baltimore City later than 10 p.m. unless the holder takes certain security measures; and requiring the Downtown Commercial District Authority to enter into a contract with the Baltimore Police Department for the hiring of two police officers to exclusively patrol certain areas at a certain time on certain days.
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - Licensee Hours of Operation and Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-0) |
2022-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753922/1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB222 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |