MD HB372 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Transportation to withhold a portion of the State's annual operating grant to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Transportation to provide an annual grant of at least $167,000,000 to pay capital costs of the Authority; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to prepare a Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan in consultation with certain entities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-41) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-41) (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (96-41)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateFloor Amendment {173721/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {979130/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-22SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (97-41)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseSpecial Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {594361/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0372&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0372f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0372t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0372e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0372_59436101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0372_97913001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0372_17372101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0372.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0372_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0372_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0292.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0372_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0972.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1102.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback